Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan (Janos) Bob (Babb)

Deceased

Bishop of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1739Bornorman
25 Dec 177738.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Apr 177838.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 178243.0SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
15 Dec 178344.2ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
6 Jun 178444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
2 Jul 178444.7InstalledBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
2 Oct 183091.0DiedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan (Janos) Bob (Babb):
Bishop Ioan (Janos) Bob (Babb) (born , died ) Bishop of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1785
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013