Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hlib (Borys Sviatoslav) Lonchyna, M.S.U.

Bishop Emeritus of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)

Apostolic Administrator of Saint Vladimir-Le-Grand de Paris (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Ap. Visitor in Italy; Spain; and Ireland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1954 Born
19 Dec 197622.8Perpetual VowsMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
15 May 197723.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
3 Jul 197723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
11 Jan 200247.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
11 Jan 200247.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
27 Feb 200248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bareta
14 Jan 200348.8AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
4 Mar 200450.0AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
4 Mar 200450.0AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
6 Dec 200450.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Dec 200854.8CeasedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
15 Dec 200854.8CeasedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
2 Jun 200955.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
14 Jun 201157.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
2 Aug 201157.4InstalledApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
18 Jan 201358.9AppointedBishop of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
18 Feb 201964.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Vladimir-Le-Grand de Paris (Ukrainian)
1 Sep 201965.5ResignedBishop of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
1 Sep 201965.5CeasedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)

MicroData Summary for Hlib (Borys Sviatoslav) Lonchyna (VIAF: 260148996135259752727)
Bishop Hlib (Borys Sviatoslav) Lonchyna M.S.U. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Holy Family of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSteubenville, OH, Diocese of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
Ordained PriestStudite Monastery, Chapel, Castelgandolfo, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 6 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,139
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013
  • c0: CB, 9 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2019
  • 11.loc: CB, 30 May 2019
  • od: CB, 8 Jun 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • visi: CB, 24 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Jul 2020

Quantcast