Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lev (Luka) Kiszka (Kyška), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663¹BornKovel
1687²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1711²48.0AppointedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
15 Mar 171148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
24 Oct 171350.8AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
24 Oct 171350.8AppointedAdministrator of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
17 Sep 171451.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Dec 171552.9ResignedAdministrator of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Nov 172865.8DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lev (Luka) Kiszka (Kyška):
Archbishop Lev (Luka) Kiszka (Kyška) O.S.B.M. (born 1663, died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,750
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 252, and Page 275, and Page 297
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,592
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015