Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josaphat Oleh Hovera

Archiepiscopal Exarch of Lutsk (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Caesariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1967 Born
30 May 199022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Apr 199325.6IncardinatedPriest of Ternopil (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jan 200840.3AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Lutsk (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jan 200840.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesariana
7 Apr 200840.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesariana

MicroData Summary for Josaphat Oleh Hovera
Bishop Josaphat Oleh Hovera (born ) Archiepiscopal Exarch of Lutsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvano-Frankivsk
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Ternopoli, Eparchy of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Lutsk (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,723
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast