Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archidioecesis Kioviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sviatoslav Shevchuk, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

(none)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian)
25 November 1995ErectedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian) (erected)
11 January 2002Territory LostArchiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian) Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian) (erected)
28 July 2003Territory LostArchiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian) Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Odessa-Krym (Ukrainian) (erected)
Archdiocese of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian)
6 December 2004ElevatedArchiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian) Archdiocese of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian)
2001367,0005413675,47741319127ap2002
2003200,2004815633,1773151648ap2004
Archdiocese of Kyiv {Kiev} (Ukrainian)
2009240,0003013435,5817181351ap2010
2012241,0004313564,3039192675ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014