Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Lemeni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1780³BornDezmir
17 Sep 180525.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Oct 180525.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 183252.3SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
15 Apr 183353.0ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
6 Jun 183353.1Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
14 Jul 183353.2InstalledBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
Mar 1850³69.9ResignedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
29 Mar 186180.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioan Lemeni:
Bishop Ioan Lemeni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013