Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaroslav Pryriz, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1963 BornLastivka
13 Dec 198724.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Dec 198825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1994²30.7ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Mar 200642.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Mar 200642.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
29 Apr 200643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
21 Apr 201047.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Oct 201148.5SucceededBishop of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaroslav Pryriz:
Bishop Jaroslav Pryriz C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Sambir-Drohobych

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,146
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2011
  • op: CB, 1 Jan 2012
  • od/odd/opd: CB, 20 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015