Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lew Ślubičz Załęnski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹Born
30 Nov 167830.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
Dec 1678²30.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1679²31.0SucceededBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1693²45.0AppointedAdministrator of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
15 Nov 169345.8AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Sep 169547.7AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1696²48.0ResignedAdministrator of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
24 Aug 170860.6DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lew Ślubičz Załęnski:
Archbishop Lew Ślubičz Załęnski O.S.B.M. (born 1648, died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 251, and Page 283, and Page 297
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015