Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Bizánczy

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹BornVelikij Rakovec
1701²44.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 171558.3SelectedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 Apr 171659.3ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 Apr 171659.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
21 Dec 171660.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
22 Jul 173376.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Bizánczy:
Bishop György Bizánczy (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013