Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Volodymyr Viytyshyn

Archbishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1959 BornDemydivka
26 May 198222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławw] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Apr 199333.4IncardinatedPriest of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 May 200343.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jul 200343.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Dec 200445.1SucceededBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Jun 200545.6AppointedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławw] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Jul 200545.7InstalledBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławw] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Nov 201152.0AppointedArchbishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Dec 201152.1InstalledArchbishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Volodymyr Viytyshyn:
Archbishop Volodymyr Viytyshyn (born ) Archbishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv]

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 30 Nov 2011
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,423
  • opd/in: CB, 4 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014