Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Meniok, C.SS.R.

Archiepiscopal Exarch of Donets’k (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Acarassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1949 BornNakonechne
8 Nov 197526.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Oct 198132.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Jul 198434.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Jan 200252.3AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Donets’k-Kharkiv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
11 Jan 200252.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Acarassus
15 Feb 200252.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acarassus

MicroData Summary for Stephan Meniok:
Bishop Stephan Meniok C.SS.R. (born ) Archiepiscopal Exarch of Donets’k

Please contact the Bishop through the Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Donets’k (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,135
  • prof/c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015