Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Vulcan

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1760³BornBalãsfalva, Romania
1784¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 180645.9SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
23 Mar 180746.5ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
7 Jun 180746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
25 Dec 183979.2DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Vulcan:
Bishop Samuel Vulcan (died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013