Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Patrick Chomnycky, O.S.B.M.

Bishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1954 Born
13 Nov 198228.4EnteredMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
16 Jun 198430.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 198833.6Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Oct 198834.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
5 Apr 200247.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
5 Apr 200247.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Buffada
11 Jun 200248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buffada
3 Jan 200651.6AppointedBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA
20 Feb 200651.7InstalledBishop of Stamford (Ukrainian), USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Patrick Chomnycky
Bishop Paul Patrick Chomnycky O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop of Stamford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVancouver, Canada
Ordained BishopSaint Basil, Church, Edmonton, Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada, Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Stamford (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,197
  • sole: CB, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ente/prof: CB, 26 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017