Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sylwester Cardinal Sembratowicz (Sembratovyc)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1836BornDeszinca
1 Nov 186024.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187942.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Feb 187942.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
20 Apr 187942.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
12 Feb 188548.4SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Mar 188548.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
29 Nov 189559.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 189659.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
4 Aug 189861.9DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Sylwester Sembratowicz (Sembratovyc):
Cardinal Sylwester Sembratowicz (Sembratovyc) (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 326, and Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013