Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Stephen Seminack

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1942Born
25 May 196725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
25 Mar 200361.0AppointedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
4 Jun 200361.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
16 Aug 201674.4DiedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Stephen Seminack
Bishop Richard Stephen Seminack (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA
Ordained BishopSaint Nicholas, Cathedral, Chicago, Eparchy of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,405
  • c1: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • d: CB, 17 Aug 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast