Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykola Simkaylo

Deceased

Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1952BornKaraganda, Kazakhstan
15 May 197421.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławw] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 May 197421.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławw] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Oct 200451.9SelectedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
2 Jun 200552.5ConfirmedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Jul 200552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Jul 200552.6InstalledBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 May 201360.5DiedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mykola Simkaylo:
Bishop Mykola Simkaylo (born , died ) Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,941
  • c2 title: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 21 May 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0: CB, 4 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Apr 2014