Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ihor Voznyak (Vozniak), C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1952 Born
1973²20.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Nov 198028.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Nov 198028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 198128.9Perpetual VowsPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Jan 200249.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
11 Jan 200249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
17 Feb 200249.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
10 Nov 200553.2AppointedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ihor Voznyak (Vozniak)
Archbishop Ihor Voznyak (Vozniak) C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLypytsi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,136
  • prof/od/c01: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 12 Sep 2017