Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasilije Božičković (Bosicskovich), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1719BornBatinyan
1741¹21.9ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1744¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
4 Sep 175940.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
11 Nov 175940.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
23 Jun 177758.4AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
9 May 178566.2DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasilije Božičković (Bosicskovich):
Bishop Vasilije Božičković (Bosicskovich) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 187, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013