Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anastazy Antoni Seljava (Sielawa)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornPołock
Oct 161734.7Ordained PriestPriest
1624¹41.0AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
18 Jan 1624³41.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
14 Feb 162441.1InstalledArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
5 Nov 164057.8SelectedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
18 Mar 164158.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Sep 1655²72.6DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Anastazy Antoni Seljava (Sielawa):
Archbishop Anastazy Antoni Seljava (Sielawa) (born 1583, died Sep 1655) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 250, and Page 281
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,897
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015