Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Joseph-Prosper Dupont, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1902BornSaint-André-lèz Lille, France
29 Jun 192826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
8 Jul 194139.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
8 Jul 194139.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dystis
9 Nov 194139.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dystis
14 Sep 195553.7AppointedBishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
12 Dec 197472.9ResignedBishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
21 Feb 199997.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for André-Joseph-Prosper Dupont:
Bishop André-Joseph-Prosper Dupont M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 57.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 59
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013