Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselme Titianma Sanon

Archbishop Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1937 BornSya
8 Sep 196225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
12 Dec 197437.3AppointedBishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
5 Apr 197537.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
5 Dec 200063.3AppointedArchbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
13 Nov 201073.2ResignedArchbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Anselme Titianma Sanon:
Archbishop Anselme Titianma Sanon , Archbishop Emeritus of Bobo-Dioulasso

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 20 Oct 2014