Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joanny Thévenoud, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou

Titular Bishop of Sitifis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1878BornSerrières-en-Chantagne, France
28 Jun 190325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
8 Jul 192143.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
8 Jul 192143.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitifis
1 May 192244.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitifis
16 Sep 194971.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Joanny Thévenoud:
Bishop Joanny Thévenoud M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013