Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Charles Dupont

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lille

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1896BornLille
26 May 192326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
24 Jul 195154.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France
24 Jul 195154.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
29 Sep 195155.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
6 Dec 197276.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Charles Dupont:
Bishop Henri-Charles Dupont (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lille

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013