Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marius Ouédraogo

Deceased

Bishop of Ouahigouya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1933BornPuni
29 Jun 196329.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 198451.0AppointedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
16 Feb 198551.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
15 Jul 199561.6DiedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Marius Ouédraogo:
Bishop Marius Ouédraogo (born , died ) Bishop of Ouahigouya

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013