Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné Yougbaré

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Koupéla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1917BornKoupéla
8 Apr 194528.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 195639.0AppointedBishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
8 Jul 195639.4Ordained BishopBishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
1 Jun 199578.3RetiredBishop of Koupéla, Burkina Faso
4 Nov 201194.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Koupéla, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Yougbaré:
Bishop Dieudonné Yougbaré (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Koupéla

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 55.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 4 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 63
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013