Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Louis Leclerc, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ségou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1905BornIsbergues
6 Oct 193227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Oct 194742.5AppointedPrefect of Gao, Mali
25 Dec 194944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
25 Dec 194944.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bamako, Mali
25 Mar 195045.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura
14 Sep 195550.4AppointedArchbishop of Bamako, Mali
10 Mar 196256.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ségou, Mali
1 Jul 197469.2ResignedBishop of Ségou, Mali
23 Nov 198378.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ségou, Mali

MicroData Summary for Pierre Louis Leclerc:
Archbishop Pierre Louis Leclerc M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ségou

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015