Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Udon Thani

Dioecesis Udonthaniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 July 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Thare and Nonseng
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 50,046 (19,330 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 62/5 Moo 5, Bypass Road, T. Nong Bua, Muang, Udon Thani 41000, Thailand
  • Telephone: (042)321.451/2
  • Fax: 243.990

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Udonthani
7 May 1953ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Thare Vicariate Apostolic of Ubon (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Udonthani (erected)
Diocese of Udonthani
18 December 1965ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Udonthani Diocese of Udonthani
Diocese of Udon Thani
2 July 1969Name ChangedDiocese of Udonthani Diocese of Udon Thani

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Udon Thani
19709,6552,005,642.5%2121459252617ap1971
198013,0023,777,885.3%12223565507251ap1981
199016,5654,804,503.3%324276131359357ap1991
199915,2085,267,331.3%922314901249955ap2000
200015,4155,284,691.3%10233346712610456ap2001
200115,6125,285,002.3%9223150312810956ap2002
200215,8015,285,002.3%1023334782810657ap2003
200316,2655,317,240.3%1226384283111060ap2004
200416,3595,318,718.3%1229413993310060ap2005
201016,8225,371,000.3%1925443822710032ap2011
201418,2045,377,000.3%1629454043210069ap2015
201719,2635,527,000.3%2032523703410073ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast