Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurelio del Pino Gómez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1888BornRiaza
17 May 191324.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 194758.3AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
3 Aug 194758.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
1 Apr 196778.3RetiredBishop of Lérida, Spain
1 Apr 196778.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
11 Dec 197082.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Castellum Minus
8 Dec 197183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Aurelio del Pino Gómez:
Bishop Aurelio del Pino Gómez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lérida

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015