Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Sanz Esparza, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuttack

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1890BornVillanova de Yerri, Spain
27 Sep 191424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
11 Nov 193242.7AppointedSuperior of Cuttack, India
14 Jun 193848.3AppointedBishop of Cuttack, India
1 Jan 193948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuttack, India
4 Mar 194858.0ResignedBishop of Cuttack, India
4 Mar 194858.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Macedonia
27 Dec 198797.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuttack, India

MicroData Summary for Florencio Sanz Esparza:
Bishop Florencio Sanz Esparza C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuttack

  • a priest for 73.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013