Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Vega Mestre

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1893BornAlcalá de Henares
21 Dec 191825.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 195056.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Feb 195157.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
24 Apr 195763.4DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Vega Mestre:
Bishop Mariano Vega Mestre (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013