Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Zonghi

Deceased

President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1847BornFabriano
3 Jun 187123.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 191467.3AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
5 Dec 191467.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
27 Dec 191467.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
8 Aug 194194.0DiedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Zonghi:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Zonghi (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013