Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Blanco Nájera

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1889Born
20 Dec 191324.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 194455.2AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Nov 194455.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
15 Jan 195262.6DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Blanco Nájera
Bishop Francisco Blanco Nájera (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagroño

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast