Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Mérida Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1891Born
1 Nov 191322.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 194352.0AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
12 Sep 194352.3Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
16 May 195665.0DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Mérida Pérez
Bishop Jesús Mérida Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCieza

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 57
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1956, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast