Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Francisco Luna Pachón, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Titiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1881Born
18 Jun 190523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jul 192645.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
17 Jul 192645.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
26 Sep 192645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
1953²71.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
15 Mar 196785.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Francisco Luna Pachón
Bishop Pedro Francisco Luna Pachón O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Santos de Maimona, Spain

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast