Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio Celestino Jáuregui y Goiri, C.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón

Titular Bishop of Mossyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1877BornLarrabezua
6 Apr 190124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
1921²43.7AppointedPrefect of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón, Peru
3 Jun 193659.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mossyna
3 Jun 193659.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón, Peru
16 Aug 193659.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mossyna
30 Aug 195780.4DiedVicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Celestino Jáuregui y Goiri:
Bishop Atanasio Celestino Jáuregui y Goiri C.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013