Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Font y Andreu

Deceased

Bishop of San Sebastián, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1894Born
23 Dec 191622.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 194450.1AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
10 Sep 194450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 May 195056.3AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
13 Feb 196369.0DiedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Font y Andreu
Bishop Jaime Font y Andreu (born , died ) Bishop of San Sebastián

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVich, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vich, Diocese of Vic

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1944, Number 43
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast