Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Almarcha Hernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1887Born
17 Jul 191022.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 194456.7AppointedBishop of León, Spain
24 Sep 194456.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
4 Apr 197082.4RetiredBishop of León, Spain
4 Apr 197082.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elepla
11 Dec 197083.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Elepla
17 Dec 197487.1DiedBishop Emeritus of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Almarcha Hernández
Bishop Luis Almarcha Hernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1944, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast