Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rafael Villanueva, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cajamarca, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1871Born
190735.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 192857.3AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
3 Feb 192957.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
2 Aug 193362.1DiedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rafael Villanueva
Bishop Antonio Rafael Villanueva O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cajamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHualgayoc

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast