Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Solano Muente y Campos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

Titular Bishop of Rhasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1898BornLima
11 Apr 192526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 May 193637.7AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
16 Aug 193637.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
21 Jul 193940.8ResignedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
21 Jul 193940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhasus
7 Aug 195152.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Francesco Solano Muente y Campos:
Bishop Francesco Solano Muente y Campos O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013