Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Souto Vizoso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1893Born
17 Jun 191623.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 194551.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
3 Feb 194551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
15 Apr 194552.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
11 Jul 194956.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
31 Mar 197077.1RetiredBishop of Palencia, Spain
31 Mar 197077.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Illici
11 Dec 197077.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Illici
2 Aug 197380.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Souto Vizoso
Bishop José Souto Vizoso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Jubia
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l'Assomption, Cathedral, Mondoñedo, Diocese of Mondoñedo

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast