Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José García y Goldaraz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1893BornHernani
21 Dec 191825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vitoria, Spain
10 Aug 194450.7AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
26 Nov 194451.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
25 Aug 195359.8AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
15 Nov 195360.0InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
2 Jul 197076.6RetiredArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
2 Jul 197076.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ferentium
11 Dec 197077.1ResignedTitular Archbishop of Ferentium
10 Jul 197379.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for José García y Goldaraz:
Archbishop José García y Goldaraz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valladolid

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015