Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Auguste Chapuis, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam

Titular Bishop of Gurza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1869BornSaint-Hostien, France
24 Sep 189223.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Mar 191141.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kumbakonam, India
6 Mar 191141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
25 Jul 191142.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 May 191344.0SucceededBishop of Kumbakonam, India
17 Dec 192859.6ResignedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
17 Dec 192859.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
14 Jul 193061.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam, India

MicroData Summary for Marie-Auguste Chapuis:
Bishop Marie-Auguste Chapuis M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015