Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Bernard Benoît Joseph Despatures, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bangalore

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1873BornGruson, France
27 Jun 189724.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Jun 192249.0AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
28 Oct 192249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
13 Feb 194066.6AppointedBishop of Bangalore, India
6 Sep 194269.2ResignedBishop of Bangalore, India
6 Sep 194269.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
26 Aug 196390.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Maurice Bernard Benoît Joseph Despatures:
Bishop Maurice Bernard Benoît Joseph Despatures M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bangalore

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013