Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mysore

Dioecesis Mysuriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangalore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 21,051 (8,130 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bangalore-Nilgiris Rd., Mysore 570001, Karnataka, India
  • Telephone: (0821)443.545
  • Fax: 565.708

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mysore
1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast Vicariate Apostolic of Mysore (erected)
Diocese of Mysore
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mysore Diocese of Mysore
12 June 1923Territory LostDiocese of Coimbatore
Diocese of Mangalore
Diocese of Mysore
Diocese of Calicut (erected)
26 May 1930Territory LostDiocese of Kumbakonam
Diocese of Mysore
Archdiocese of Pondicherry
Diocese of Salem (erected)
13 February 1940Territory LostDiocese of Mysore Diocese of Bangalore (erected)
3 July 1955Territory LostDiocese of Mysore Diocese of Ootacamund (erected)
16 November 1963Territory LostDiocese of Mysore Diocese of Chikmagalur (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mysore
195065,7753,600,8001.8%81818122325342ap1951
197037,3503,032,1451.2%38215963326278ap1971
198054,0714,641,6251.2%5412668192038738ap1981
199066,5004,795,0001.4%654010563315652044ap1991
199988,4007,740,6001.1%844512968512569161ap2000
200090,1007,942,7001.1%824612870312869461ap2001
200193,3797,964,5291.2%854813370212668563ap2002
200295,2608,077,0851.2%88881,08210472065ap2003
200388,0009,833,900.9%837115457116183967ap2004
200494,5009,840,5001.0%867516158624986367ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 11 Aug 2013