Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Biet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Thibet, China

Titular Bishop of Diana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1838Born
1862¹23.1ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Jan 186425.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Jul 187839.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
27 Aug 187839.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
24 Nov 187840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
9 Sep 190162.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félix Biet
Bishop Félix Biet M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Thibet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangres, Diocese of Langres, France

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast