Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine-Antoine Roy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore

Titular Bishop of Citharizum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1863BornLe Pin, France
8 Jul 188825.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Feb 190441.1AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
17 Apr 190441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbatore, India
4 Dec 193067.9RetiredBishop of Coimbatore, India
4 Dec 193067.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Citharizum
21 Dec 193774.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Augustine-Antoine Roy:
Bishop Augustine-Antoine Roy M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013