Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Louis Kleiner, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mysore, India

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1841Born
27 Sep 186423.2ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Jun 186523.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Jun 189048.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mysore, India
20 Jun 189048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
14 Sep 189049.1SucceededBishop of Mysore, India
21 Sep 189049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
2 Jun 191068.9ResignedBishop of Mysore, India
17 Jun 191068.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
19 Aug 191574.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Louis Kleiner (VIAF: 39367555)
Bishop Eugène-Louis Kleiner M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThionville, Diocese of Metz, France
Ordained BishopMEP, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 356, and Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017