Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innayya Chinna Addagatla

Bishop of Srikakulam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1937 BornRavipadu
4 Jan 196527.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 198952.0AppointedBishop of Nalgonda, India
29 Jun 198952.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nalgonda, India
1 Jul 199356.2AppointedBishop of Srikakulam, India

MicroData Summary for Innayya Chinna Addagatla:
Bishop Innayya Chinna Addagatla (born ) Bishop of Srikakulam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Srikakulam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013