Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joji Govindu

Bishop of Nalgonda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1944 BornDharmaram
26 Dec 196925.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 199752.9AppointedBishop of Nalgonda, India
24 Jun 199753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nalgonda, India
9 Aug 201268.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vijayawada, India
2 Feb 201671.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Vijayawada, India

MicroData Summary for Joji Govindu
Bishop Joji Govindu (born ) Bishop of Nalgonda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nalgonda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Sep 2016