Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nellore

Dioecesis Nellorensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 July 1928
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 30,800 (11,896 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Nellore-524001, A.P., India
  • Telephone: (0861)331.038
  • Fax: 323.950

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 July 1928ErectedArchdiocese of Madras Diocese of Nellore (erected)
13 February 1940Territory LostDiocese of Nellore Diocese of Guntur (erected)
12 June 1967Territory LostDiocese of Nellore Diocese of Kurnool (erected)
19 October 1976Territory LostDiocese of Nellore Diocese of Cuddapah (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195024,5935,000,000.5%20385842414930ap1951
197044,7535,303,710.8%50454828672ap1971
198036,3083,670,0001.0%279361,0081013833ap1981
199047,1264,673,3911.0%49756841718841ap1991
199962,8716,086,7871.0%1005105598521968ap2000
200064,7376,115,1541.1%974101640621069ap2001
200166,8626,343,4621.1%1004104642621872ap2002
200268,7656,531,3121.1%11181195771022479ap2003
200369,2046,499,5341.1%1076113612822074ap2004
200479,7656,601,3121.2%11081186751023379ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 28 Nov 2012